NY A07967 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - signed chap.64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - signed chap.64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to veterans' health care options and requires the division of veterans' affairs to post certain information on its website.
Title
Relates to veterans' health care options and requires the division of veterans' affairs to post certain information on its website.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | signed chap.64 |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.360 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3137C |
2016-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.680 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | print number 7967b |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | print number 7967a |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S03137 (Same As) 2016-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7967B