NY A07965 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to restrict the taking of fish, shellfish and crustacea in special management areas.
Title
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to restrict the taking of fish, shellfish and crustacea in special management areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Senate | signed chap.209 |
2017-08-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2132 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5748 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.180 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.180 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05748 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7965