NY A07963 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts contractors employed by certain large municipalities from payment of asbestos project notification fees for demolitions.
Title
Exempts contractors employed by certain large municipalities from payment of asbestos project notification fees for demolitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.540 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1535 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1598A |
2014-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.265 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.265 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S01598 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7963