NY A07955 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - print number 7955a
Pending: Assembly Libraries and Education Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enables public libraries to access employment preparation education (EPE) funds to provide adult literacy education; sets aside one million dollars to be awarded through a competitive grant process; provides that half of such appropriation shall be set aside for libraries serving a population of one million or more.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enables public libraries to access employment preparation education (EPE) funds to provide adult literacy education; sets aside one million dollars to be awarded through a competitive grant process; provides that half of such appropriation shall be set aside for libraries serving a population of one million or more.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-14Assemblyprint number 7955a
2024-05-14Assemblyamend and recommit to libraries and education technology
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to libraries and education technology
2023-08-18Assemblyreferred to libraries and education technology

Same As/Similar To

S06136 (Same As) 2024-05-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback