NY A07948 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to fire suppression systems and licensing professionals to perform authorized work on fire suppression systems.
Title
Relates to fire suppression systems and licensing professionals to perform authorized work on fire suppression systems.
Sponsors
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] |
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. David Buchwald [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S04403 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES