NY A07947 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that if the net balance of the reimbursement account exceeds two million five hundred thousand dollars, any amount over two million five hundred thousand dollars shall be transferred to the proprietary vocational school supervision account.
Title
Provides that if the net balance of the reimbursement account exceeds two million five hundred thousand dollars, any amount over two million five hundred thousand dollars shall be transferred to the proprietary vocational school supervision account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.564 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.178 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.178 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06510 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION