NY A07945 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s7055
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s7055
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to the residential care off-site facility demonstration project.
Title
Extends provisions relating to the residential care off-site facility demonstration project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s7055 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.639 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.639 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-05 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07055 (Same As) 2021-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.185