NY A07945 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s6686
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s6686
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to damages to contracts occasioned by delay.
Title
Relates to damages to contracts occasioned by delay.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6686 |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.953 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | print number 7945a |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06686 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.355