NY A07938 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the animal control officer in the town of Sand Lake as a peace officer.
Title
Designates the animal control officer in the town of Sand Lake as a peace officer.
Sponsors
Sen. Jacob Ashby [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.281 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.789 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.789 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02563 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CODES