NY A07936 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - signed chap.271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - signed chap.271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to tax abatement for certain industrial and commercial properties in a city with a population of one million or more.
Title
Relates to tax abatement for certain industrial and commercial properties in a city with a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Senate | signed chap.271 |
2015-09-15 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5088 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.744 |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.744 |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05088 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7936