NY A07935 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s7100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s7100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requirements and timetables for the reduction in provisional appointments by the New York city department of citywide administrative services; adds additional titles for the administration of competitive examinations.
Title
Relates to requirements and timetables for the reduction in provisional appointments by the New York city department of citywide administrative services; adds additional titles for the administration of competitive examinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s7100 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.636 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.636 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07100 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.386