NY A07923 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - print number 7923c
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - print number 7923c
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to improving educational outcomes for homeless school age children.
Title
Relates to improving educational outcomes for homeless school age children.
Sponsors
Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D] | Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D] |
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Assembly | print number 7923c |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | print number 7923b |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | print number 7923a |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S02106 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - referred to education