NY A07919 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-22 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the home improvement fraud prevention act relating to the responsibilities of home improvement contractors and requiring home improvement contractors to register with the secretary of state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the home improvement fraud prevention act relating to the responsibilities of home improvement contractors and requiring home improvement contractors to register with the secretary of state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-22Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2024-05-07Assemblyreported referred to codes
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2023-08-04Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S04066 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback