NY A07919 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Good Samaritan Hospital Medical Center, town of Islip, county of Suffolk, to file an application for a real property tax exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the Good Samaritan Hospital Medical Center, town of Islip, county of Suffolk, to file an application for a real property tax exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-22Senate3RD READING CAL.839
2020-07-22SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8018
2020-06-09SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-06-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-06-09Assemblypassed assembly
2020-01-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.294
2020-01-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-01-08SenateDIED IN SENATE
2019-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.661
2019-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.661
2019-06-20Assemblyreported
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-28Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S08018 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7919

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07919&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07919&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07919
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07919&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07919&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07919&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07919&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A7919#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback