NY A07907 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-16 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-16 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorization of debt in times of public emergency; relates to a limit on state funded debt and refunding of state debts.
Title
Relates to authorization of debt in times of public emergency; relates to a limit on state funded debt and refunding of state debts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2012-01-18 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2011-05-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06364 (Same As) 2012-02-13 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION