NY A07905 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - signed chap.80
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that a parent of a minor or incapacitated person may designate another person as a person in parental relation to such minor or incapacitated person pursuant to sections twenty-one hundred sixty-four and twenty-five hundred four of the public health law and sections two and thirty-two hundred twelve of the education law for a period not exceeding twelve months; provides that a designation may not be more than twelve months.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that a parent of a minor or incapacitated person may designate another person as a person in parental relation to such minor or incapacitated person pursuant to sections twenty-one hundred sixty-four and twenty-five hundred four of the public health law and sections two and thirty-two hundred twelve of the education law for a period not exceeding twelve months; provides that a designation may not be more than twelve months.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27Senatesigned chap.80
2018-06-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-11SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-11Senate3RD READING CAL.134
2018-06-11SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6016A
2018-03-26SenateREFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
2018-03-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-26Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.560
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.553
2017-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.553
2017-06-20Assemblyreported
2017-06-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-09Assemblyprint number 7905a
2017-06-09Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to judiciary
2017-05-18Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S06016 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7905A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07905&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07905&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07905
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07905&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07905A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07905&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07905&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07905&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A7905#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback