NY A07900 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the New York state teachers' retirement system to accept an application for disability retirement benefits from Karen Sosinski.
Title
Authorizes the New York state teachers' retirement system to accept an application for disability retirement benefits from Karen Sosinski.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental employees |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | print number 7900a |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05133 (Same As) 2022-03-22 - PRINT NUMBER 5133A