NY A07892 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - amended on third reading 7892a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - amended on third reading 7892a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to conduct a study on the rates of reimbursement made through the New York state Medicaid durable medical equipment, orthotics, prosthetics and supplies program for rate adequacy and patient access.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to conduct a study on the rates of reimbursement made through the New York state Medicaid durable medical equipment, orthotics, prosthetics and supplies program for rate adequacy and patient access.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7892a |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.410 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.410 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07023 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - referred to ways and means