NY A07892 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - signed chap.135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - signed chap.135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Oneida County Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Oneida County Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Senate | signed chap.135 |
2015-08-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5761 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.681 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.681 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05761 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7892