NY A07889 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions relating to audit and review of medical assistance program funds by the Medicaid inspector general; prohibits additional review without error or new information; requires application of rules in place at the time funds were paid to providers; requires notice to recipients of medical assistance funds of certain investigations.
Title
Amends provisions relating to audit and review of medical assistance program funds by the Medicaid inspector general; prohibits additional review without error or new information; requires application of rules in place at the time funds were paid to providers; requires notice to recipients of medical assistance funds of certain investigations.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-09 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-09 | Assembly | vetoed memo.89 |
2022-12-02 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1212 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4486B |
2022-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.409 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.409 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | print number 7889a |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04486 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7889A