NY A07888 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the payment of retirement benefits by the New York state teachers' retirement system to Dominic J. Feminella, the widower of Jeannette M. Feminella, if he shall file an option election form with the retirement board of such retirement system.
Title
Authorizes the payment of retirement benefits by the New York state teachers' retirement system to Dominic J. Feminella, the widower of Jeannette M. Feminella, if he shall file an option election form with the retirement board of such retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental employees |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | print number 7888a |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06730 (Same As) 2022-05-03 - PRINT NUMBER 6730B