NY A07885 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - print number 7885a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits a grand jury to inspect medical records pursuant to subpoena duces tecum powers and requires the disclosure of information when a crime is committed against a patient.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits a grand jury to inspect medical records pursuant to subpoena duces tecum powers and requires the disclosure of information when a crime is committed against a patient.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25Assemblyprint number 7885a
2020-02-25Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2019-05-28Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S04759 (Same As) 2020-02-27 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback