NY A07880 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s7154
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s7154
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Gina Kehoe to take the competitive civil service examination and be placed on the eligible civil service list for employment as a full-time police officer for the town of Montgomery police department, notwithstanding the maximum age requirements for such examination.
Title
Authorizes Gina Kehoe to take the competitive civil service examination and be placed on the eligible civil service list for employment as a full-time police officer for the town of Montgomery police department, notwithstanding the maximum age requirements for such examination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s7154 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.735 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.735 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | print number 7880a |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07154 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.388