NY A07877 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - print number 7877a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - print number 7877a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to electronic delivery of property/casualty insurance notices and posting property/casualty insurance policies on the internet; authorizes electronic delivery of insurance notices with consent and the posting of policies on the internet if certain conditions are met; requires notice in the subject line of an email to be clear and conspicuous and also requires a receiving party to acknowledge receipt through a clickwrap agreement.
Title
Relates to electronic delivery of property/casualty insurance notices and posting property/casualty insurance policies on the internet; authorizes electronic delivery of insurance notices with consent and the posting of policies on the internet if certain conditions are met; requires notice in the subject line of an email to be clear and conspicuous and also requires a receiving party to acknowledge receipt through a clickwrap agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | print number 7877a |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07583 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE