NY A07872 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5467a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5467a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the city of New York to sell tax lots to abutting owners that cannot be independently developed.
Title
Extends the authority of the city of New York to sell tax lots to abutting owners that cannot be independently developed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5467a |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.626 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.626 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S05467 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.505