NY A07871 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - print number 7871a
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - print number 7871a
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any person from slaughtering a horse where such person knows or has reason to know that such horse will be used for human consumption; and prohibits any person from possessing, importing into or exporting from the state, selling, buying, giving away, holding or accepting any horse with the intent of killing, or having another kill, such horse, if such person knows or should have known that any part of such horse will be used for human consumption; and provides penalties for violation.
Title
Prohibits any person from slaughtering a horse where such person knows or has reason to know that such horse will be used for human consumption; and prohibits any person from possessing, importing into or exporting from the state, selling, buying, giving away, holding or accepting any horse with the intent of killing, or having another kill, such horse, if such person knows or should have known that any part of such horse will be used for human consumption; and provides penalties for violation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Assembly | print number 7871a |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S05983 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO AGRICULTURE