NY A07867 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5752a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5752a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the burial of indigent veterans of the armed forces of the United States.
Title
Relates to the burial of indigent veterans of the armed forces of the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s5752a |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.425 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.425 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | print number 7867a |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S05752 (Same As) 2015-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.33