NY A07864 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a lottery game for the support and assistance of wartime veterans.
Title
Authorizes a lottery game for the support and assistance of wartime veterans.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Curran [R] | Asm. Mark Johns [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2012-02-16 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2012-01-18 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-05-23 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2011-05-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |