NY A07863 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - substituted by s6015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Decreases the amount of voting members of the Michigan Street African American Heritage Corridor commission in Buffalo; and extends provisions relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Decreases the amount of voting members of the Michigan Street African American Heritage Corridor commission in Buffalo; and extends provisions relating thereto.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted by s6015
2019-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.198
2019-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.198
2019-06-12Assemblyreported
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-24Assemblyreferred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development

Same As/Similar To

S06015 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback