NY A07863 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the taxation of business corporations.
Title
Relates to the taxation of business corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | Senate | signed chap.302 |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2222 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6615 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.250 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.250 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | print number 7863a |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06615 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7863A