NY A07859 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - approval memo.5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the licensure of private proprietary schools; provides for increased competition among schools to improve the quality of training provided at private proprietary schools and the quality of student performance in the workplace.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the licensure of private proprietary schools; provides for increased competition among schools to improve the quality of training provided at private proprietary schools and the quality of student performance in the workplace.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17Senateapproval memo.5
2012-08-17Senatesigned chap.381
2012-08-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1303
2012-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4268C
2012-04-30SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2012-04-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-04-30Assemblypassed assembly
2012-04-26Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.487
2012-04-25Assemblyreported
2012-03-27Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-03-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to higher education
2011-12-30Assemblyprint number 7859a
2011-12-30Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2011-05-19Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S04268 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7859A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback