NY A07856 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an occupancy tax of seven percent of the per diem rental rate of hotel rooms in the village of Weedsport, county of Cayuga.
Title
Authorizes an occupancy tax of seven percent of the per diem rental rate of hotel rooms in the village of Weedsport, county of Cayuga.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.694 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.694 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | print number 7856a |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08920 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - PRINT NUMBER 8920A