NY A07853 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-24 - signed chap.283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-24 - signed chap.283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adding a representative from WUFO Studios to the Michigan Street African Heritage Corridor commission.
Title
Relates to adding a representative from WUFO Studios to the Michigan Street African Heritage Corridor commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.283 |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1079 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5898 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.510 |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | committed to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.321 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.181 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.181 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S05898 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7853