NY A07852 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - advanced to third reading cal.999
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - advanced to third reading cal.999
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes an occupancy tax in the city of Cortland to be used for tourism development and promotion.
Title
Imposes an occupancy tax in the city of Cortland to be used for tourism development and promotion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.999 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | print number 7852b |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | print number 7852a |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05861 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - PRINT NUMBER 5861B