NY A07846 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - APPROVAL MEMO.22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - APPROVAL MEMO.22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain state land, Cedar Street Southbound Extension, to the city of New Rochelle.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain state land, Cedar Street Southbound Extension, to the city of New Rochelle.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.22 |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.566 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.465 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a7846a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1616 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6228A |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6228a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.465 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.465 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | print number 7846a |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06228 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - APPROVAL MEMO.22