NY A07824 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - print number 7824a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the benefits of the variable supplements fund for transit police members of the New York city employees' retirement system for persons who retired on or after October 1, 1968.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the benefits of the variable supplements fund for transit police members of the New York city employees' retirement system for persons who retired on or after October 1, 1968.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-29Assemblyprint number 7824a
2024-02-29Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2023-06-15Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S09274 (Same As) 2024-05-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback