NY A07822 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires all incarcerated individuals who do not have a high-school diploma or its equivalent to receive a reading proficiency-level assessment and dyslexia screening upon intake; and requires for such individuals who perform below a certain proficiency level to be provided with dyslexia intervention that is evidence-based effective and consistent with science-based research specifically tailored to addressing dyslexia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires all incarcerated individuals who do not have a high-school diploma or its equivalent to receive a reading proficiency-level assessment and dyslexia screening upon intake; and requires for such individuals who perform below a certain proficiency level to be provided with dyslexia intervention that is evidence-based effective and consistent with science-based research specifically tailored to addressing dyslexia.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-07-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-07-21Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.238
2020-07-21Assemblyrules report cal.238
2020-07-21Assemblyreported
2020-07-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to correction
2019-05-23Assemblyreferred to correction

Same As/Similar To

S06787 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback