NY A07821 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - print number 7821a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to supplemental military retirement allowances for members of public retirement systems of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to supplemental military retirement allowances for members of public retirement systems of the state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-24Assemblyprint number 7821a
2024-05-24Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2023-06-15Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S07529 (Same As) 2024-05-22 - PRINT NUMBER 7529A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback