NY A07814 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - print number 7814a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - print number 7814a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends requirements for licensure to practice funeral directing to include national assessment standards and permits practice by persons with valid work permits.
Title
Amends requirements for licensure to practice funeral directing to include national assessment standards and permits practice by persons with valid work permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Assembly | print number 7814a |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04367 (Same As) 2018-01-12 - PRINT NUMBER 4367A