NY A07805 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - signed chap.225
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - signed chap.225
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York city public housing preservation trust for properties owned or operated by the New York city housing authority; provides for the issuance of certain bonds, notes or other obligations of the New York city housing development corporation.
Title
Establishes the New York city public housing preservation trust for properties owned or operated by the New York city housing authority; provides for the issuance of certain bonds, notes or other obligations of the New York city housing development corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Assembly | signed chap.225 |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1793 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9409A |
2022-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.537 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.537 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-28 | Assembly | print number 7805d |
2022-05-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | print number 7805c |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 7805b |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | print number 7805a |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06999 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
S09409 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7805D
S09409 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7805D