NY A07802 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - substituted by s5087
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - substituted by s5087
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization of the county of Monroe to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends the authorization of the county of Monroe to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Assembly | substituted by s5087 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.303 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.303 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05087 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.206