NY A07794 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the timeframe for the implementation of recommendations included within final reports for corrective action to one hundred eighty days.
Title
Extends the timeframe for the implementation of recommendations included within final reports for corrective action to one hundred eighty days.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.507 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1256 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5448 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.575 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05448 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - signed chap.507