NY A07787 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notification to the department of public service of any incident involving damage to any underground facility.
Title
Requires notification to the department of public service of any incident involving damage to any underground facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |