NY A07770 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s7475b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s7475b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for regulating immigration bail businesses including restrictions on who may operate such a business; provides for who may bring an action against an immigration bail business.
Title
Provides for regulating immigration bail businesses including restrictions on who may operate such a business; provides for who may bring an action against an immigration bail business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s7475b |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.454 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | rules report cal.454 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | print number 7770c |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | print number 7770b |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | print number 7770a |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07475 (Same As) 2022-12-09 - SIGNED CHAP.673