NY A07766 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes provisions authorizing big game hunting in Seneca county permanent.
Title
Makes provisions authorizing big game hunting in Seneca county permanent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Senate | signed chap.204 |
2017-08-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1908 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6025 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.571 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06025 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7766