NY A07765 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from November 30, 2017 to November 30, 2019, the expiration of the authorization granted to the county of Montgomery to impose an additional 1% of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends from November 30, 2017 to November 30, 2019, the expiration of the authorization granted to the county of Montgomery to impose an additional 1% of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05952 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS