NY A07763 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-10)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s426b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s426b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes vehicles operated by sanitation workers in the definition of "hazard vehicle".
Title
Includes vehicles operated by sanitation workers in the definition of "hazard vehicle".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s426b |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.393 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | print number 7763b |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | print number 7763a |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00426 (Same As) 2016-08-31 - SIGNED CHAP.293