NY A07756 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - print number 7756a
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - print number 7756a
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases from $300 to $600 the monthly rent subsidy payable for housing for a foster child living independently in certain circumstances; doesn't limit those from living with roommates.
Title
Increases from $300 to $600 the monthly rent subsidy payable for housing for a foster child living independently in certain circumstances; doesn't limit those from living with roommates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | Assembly | print number 7756a |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S01615 (Same As) 2016-02-02 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE