NY A07755 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-09 - substituted by s7561
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to procedures for appointment and reappointment of notaries public, certificates of official character, and certification of electronic notarial records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to procedures for appointment and reappointment of notaries public, certificates of official character, and certification of electronic notarial records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-09Assemblysubstituted by s7561
2023-06-08Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.746
2023-06-08Assemblyrules report cal.746
2023-06-08Assemblyreported
2023-06-08Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-06-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S07561 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.188

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback