NY A07750 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - signed chap.386
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - signed chap.386
Summary
Authorizes the town of Ramapo to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land located in the village of Montebello, town of Ramapo at 319 Haverstraw Road.
Title
Authorizes the town of Ramapo to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land located in the town of Ramapo, county of Rockland.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | signed chap.386 | |
2009-08-14 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.801 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5337A | |
2009-06-15 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-16 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-15 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-15 | ordered to third reading rules cal.289 | |
2009-06-15 | rules report cal.289 | |
2009-06-15 | reported | |
2009-06-15 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-02 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-05-29 | print number 7750a | |
2009-05-29 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | |
2009-04-23 | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05337 (Same As) 2009-08-26 - signed chap.386
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07750&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |